U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Plocek-Swanson v. Target Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 12, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 02, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice - Other]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 28, 2021: [Compel]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 10, 2021: [Compel]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 02, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.