U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Hala v. Marshall County Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • January 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 07, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.