U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Pladsen v. Skinner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 05, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 02, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.