U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Schmidt v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 02, 2021: [Errata]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 05, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Removal By USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.