U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00010
  • Case Name: DeWall et al v. Medical Protective Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • November 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 10, 2021: [Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 30, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • September 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 14, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 05, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • February 04, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • February 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.