U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. JEENS, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 28, 2022: [Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • June 09, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 10, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 09, 2022: [Stay]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • March 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • March 08, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 18, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 16, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 15, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 15, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • February 15, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 01, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice - Other]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Quash]
  • January 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 28, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 19, 2022: [Quash]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 18, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 07, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 09, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.