U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04059
  • Case Name: Pedersen v. Foxhoven, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • June 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 08, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.