U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Barngrover v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.