U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Nicolai v. Hastie et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • October 05, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • August 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • August 18, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • August 17, 2021: [Leave]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.