U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Foote v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Strike]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 01, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 24, 2022: [Seal]
  • January 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 17, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 17, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 17, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 27, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 27, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 23, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 14, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • May 05, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.