U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Nieters v. Holton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Exhibits Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [Strike]
  • May 16, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • May 13, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 20, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 15, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.