U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Siedlik v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice - Other]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 09, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.