U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Grice v. Iowa Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 03, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 11, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.