U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04007
  • Case Name: Rembrandt Enterprises Inc v. Tecno Poultry Equipment, SpA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 27, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Intervene]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Intervene]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.