U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Mundy v. Polk County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.