U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Smith v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Quash]
  • December 16, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 06, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • December 02, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice - Other]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 16, 2022: [Certificate]
  • June 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Certificate]
  • May 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 19, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 17, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.