U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Manpower US Inc.,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2021: [Reopen Case]
  • April 02, 2021: [Reopen Case]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.