U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Talley v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • December 22, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 20, 2021: [Seal]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • May 20, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 10, 2021: [Brief /Other]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.