U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04009
  • Case Name: Young v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Case Ready for Decision]
  • September 10, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 08, 2021: [Seal Document]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 16, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.