U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Flores et al v. BHA Group, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [File Overlength Brief]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 12, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 29, 2022: [Expedite]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Intervene]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.