U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Dean v. Nestle Purina Pet Care Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Closing Documents]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.