U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02010
  • Case Name: DeBower v. Spencer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2021: [In Limine]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 20, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 05, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Remand to State Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.