U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-03004
  • Case Name: VeroBlue Farms USA Inc v. Gagne
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Quash]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 04, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.