U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Dunn et al v. John Doe 1-60 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Errata]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.