U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Delta Dental of Iowa v. Allied World Specialty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 09, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • August 08, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • August 05, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 05, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • August 04, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • August 03, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 22, 2022: [Errata]
  • July 22, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 21, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 20, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • July 20, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • June 24, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 22, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • June 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • May 24, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • May 23, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • May 23, 2022: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • May 20, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 20, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 18, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 20, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 19, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 16, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 15, 2021: [Counterclaim]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • February 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.