U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Tolston v. Iowa City, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Add Party]
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 07, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2021: [Add Party]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 18, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 17, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 17, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 06, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 06, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 06, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 05, 2021: [Seal]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.