U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Graham v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 21, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 08, 2022: [Leave to File]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Leave]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • August 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2021
  • February 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.