U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Fricke v. DLL Finance LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • April 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 23, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 23, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • February 23, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 22, 2021: [Certificate]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.