U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Ward v. Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc., Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 15, 2021: [Change Venue]
  • March 12, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Change Venue]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 22, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.