U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03054
  • Case Name: Long v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 26, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.