U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Tumoe v. Wilkinson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • August 23, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Status Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.