U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Guzman Mendez v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 24, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.