U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Grant v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2021: [Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 05, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 05, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 24, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • February 23, 2021: [LR 10 Clerk's Staff Note]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.