U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Tabbert Transportation, LLC v. Wheatley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Sealed Document]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • March 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 24, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.