U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00008
  • Case Name: United States of America v. US FED Group, LLC et al DEF St James allowed to submit filings electronically. Clerk's Office to serve St James via email
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Strike]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 16, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 16, 2021: [Deposit Funds]
  • April 12, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • April 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Default Entry]
  • April 05, 2021: [Seal Document]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 26, 2021: [Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.