U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01016
  • Case Name: Menge v. Simon's Trucking Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • April 02, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 16, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 26, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.