U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Reimers v. Stratofalcon Investments LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • August 03, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
February, 2021
  • February 28, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.