U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Adam v. CHW Group, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 17, 2021: [Strike]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.