U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Harris v. Bennett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 06, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 19, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 25, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 05, 2022: [Statement]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 28, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 10, 2022: [Expedite]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 23, 2022: [Expedite]
  • May 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 02, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 10, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.