U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Downs et al v. DSM Food Specialties USA, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • November 26, 2021: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • November 12, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • October 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • October 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 28, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 28, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 24, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 15, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • August 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 30, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 28, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 20, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 16, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 09, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 08, 2021: [Leave]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Joinder]
  • July 02, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Joinder]
  • June 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 28, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • June 28, 2021: [Leave]
  • June 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 25, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 22, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 04, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 03, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 20, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 20, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 18, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: [Joinder]
  • May 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 17, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 17, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 17, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 14, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 14, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 14, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 13, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 11, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 04, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 03, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2021: [Leave]
  • April 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 15, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 12, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.