U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00026
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 2018 Dodge Charger Hellcat SR VIN: 2C3CDXL9XJH289135 and 2018 Polaris RZR S 1000,VIN:3NSVBE992JH214296
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 10, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • April 21, 2022: [Substitute Party]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Errata]
  • October 21, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 06, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2021: [Strike]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2021: [Claim]
  • June 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 27, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 14, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 14, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 06, 2021: [Status Report Order]
  • May 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Claim]
  • April 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 18, 2021: [Writ Returned]
  • March 16, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • March 15, 2021: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • March 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.