U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Sundermann v. Holt
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 06, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.