U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Gay v. Scott County Iowa District Court
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 02, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 16, 2021: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • March 16, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • March 16, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 16, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.