U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Schafer v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • December 06, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • August 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 20, 2021: [Affidavit]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 17, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.