U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00014
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $11,022.00 in U.S.Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice - Other]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 10, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.