U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Schwab v. John Doe 1 & 2 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.