U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Martin v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Leave]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 22, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • October 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 21, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 14, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 23, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.