U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 02, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.