U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Purvis v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 29, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 20, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [More Definite Statement]
  • July 14, 2021: [More Definite Statement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 26, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.