U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Lomax v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Documents Sent]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 26, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.